U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Harrison v Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 16, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 16, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 16, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 09, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • January 02, 2018: [Letter(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order]
  • December 26, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.