U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00209
  • Case Name: Johnson et al v. Laramie County Board of County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 15, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [Dismissing Party]
  • June 10, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • October 10, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 09, 2019: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • October 09, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • September 09, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 27, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 26, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • August 26, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 23, 2019: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • August 15, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 25, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 19, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 05, 2019: [Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Joinder]
  • June 28, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Brief]
  • June 10, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Protective Order]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 29, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 30, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 26, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 22, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 22, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 16, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 15, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 01, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 01, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 25, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 17, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 19, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.