U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Ferrin v. Cabela's Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 12, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 14, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 02, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Status Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 13, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 08, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 26, 2018: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 11, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 08, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Removal]
  • December 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 19, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 19, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.