U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Memorial Hospital of Laramie County v. GE Johnson Construction Company Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 02, 2019: [Vacating Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 25, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • November 16, 2018: [Crossclaim]
  • November 16, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 14, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 13, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • November 13, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 05, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 28, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 27, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 26, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • June 26, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • June 01, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 01, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2018: [Third Party Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • May 31, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 31, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Financial Entry]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 23, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 11, 2018: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • January 11, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 04, 2018: [Removal]
  • January 03, 2018: [Stay Case]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 28, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.