U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00212
  • Case Name: Peter D Holdings LLC et al v. Wold Oil Properties LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • September 29, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • September 24, 2020: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • September 11, 2020: [Objection]
  • September 08, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 08, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • September 08, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2020: [Memorandum & Opinion]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 09, 2020: [Objection]
  • April 03, 2020: [Supplement]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • January 10, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Brief]
  • December 10, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • December 05, 2019: [Transcript]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 21, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 21, 2019: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • November 20, 2019: [Bench Trial]
  • November 19, 2019: [Bench Trial]
  • November 18, 2019: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 22, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 16, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • October 15, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 15, 2019: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • October 11, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 04, 2019: [Compel]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 30, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Response]
  • August 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 08, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 02, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 22, 2019: [Response]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 22, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 16, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 19, 2019: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • June 18, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 14, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • April 22, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 13, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 31, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 10, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Strike]
  • August 29, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 14, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • May 09, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • May 09, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 13, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Financial Entry]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 05, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.