U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Huseby v. Crisler
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 08, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 18, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 20, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 15, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 15, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 15, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 20, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • January 16, 2018: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 11, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • January 04, 2018: [Removal]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 29, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.