U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00001
  • Case Name: River Rail Community Federal Credit Union v. Mears
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Reply Brief]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Appendix]
  • March 29, 2018: [Brief]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 22, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 19, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 12, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • January 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 11, 2018: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • January 03, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 02, 2018: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
  • January 02, 2018: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.