U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Andrus et al v. Thayne WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 13, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 12, 2018: [Exhibit/Witness List]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 03, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 22, 2018: [Vacate]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of Complexity]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 09, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.