U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Poutre v Wright et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Reply]
  • July 16, 2018: [Response]
  • July 11, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • July 11, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 09, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Martinez Report]
  • June 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 29, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • June 25, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • June 22, 2018: [Opposition]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 30, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • May 29, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • May 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 29, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 23, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 30, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2018: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Letter(s)]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.