U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Slotta et al v. Avery
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • January 29, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 25, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Response]
  • December 12, 2018: [Response]
  • December 07, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 03, 2018: [Supplement]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Supplement]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 17, 2018: [Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 22, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • February 14, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.