U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Elliott v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [USCA Order]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Mandate]
  • May 15, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • May 15, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [10th Circuit Filing]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 15, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Reconsideration]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 25, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Letter(s)]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Reply to Response]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [USCA Order]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 02, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 08, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 08, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 08, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • April 19, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 19, 2018: [Stipulation of Facts]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 25, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 22, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 17, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 17, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.