U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Nonstop Administration and Insurance Services v. Community Health Center of Central Wyoming Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2019: [Statement]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 22, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 22, 2019: [Stipulation of Facts]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Setting Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Strike]
  • November 28, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Protective Order]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 11, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 13, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 26, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 26, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.