U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Munoz v. Hailey-Wright et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2018: [Dismissing Party]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 09, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 03, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • April 17, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 23, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order]
  • March 19, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 13, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • March 08, 2018: [Service of Process]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.