U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Sanderson v. Wyoming Highway Patrol et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 09, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • November 10, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 10, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 10, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • November 09, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • November 09, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 05, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 03, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • November 03, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2021: [Jury Questionnaires]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • October 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 20, 2021: [In Limine]
  • August 05, 2021: [Transcript - SEALED]
  • August 05, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Mandate]
  • October 22, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 28, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Transcript]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • April 15, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 15, 2019: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • March 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • March 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 25, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2019: [Statement]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • February 25, 2019: [Deposition]
  • February 25, 2019: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • February 25, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • February 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 25, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 25, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • February 25, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 21, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • February 21, 2019: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 14, 2019: [Objection]
  • February 13, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 12, 2019: [Response]
  • February 12, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 12, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 11, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 11, 2019: [Response]
  • February 07, 2019: [Objection]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury Questionnaires]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2019: [Jury Questionnaires]
  • February 05, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 25, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 14, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • December 12, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • December 11, 2018: [Objection]
  • December 07, 2018: [Opposition]
  • December 07, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • November 30, 2018: [In Limine]
  • November 28, 2018: [In Court Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • November 06, 2018: [Opposition]
  • November 06, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 29, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 04, 2018: [Reply]
  • October 03, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2018: [Quash]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Witness List]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 29, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 27, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 05, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 22, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • January 22, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.