U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Bear Energy Services LLC v. Rockwater Rockies LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 02, 2018: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 20, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 12, 2018: [Protective Order]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Acceptance of Service]
  • February 02, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 02, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • February 01, 2018: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Removal]
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 23, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • January 23, 2018: [Complaint]
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.