U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Goodspeed et al v. Wyoming Governor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 11, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • March 09, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • March 09, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • March 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 02, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 02, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 01, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 01, 2018: [Response]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 27, 2018: [Response]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 12, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 08, 2018: [Set Aside]
  • February 08, 2018: [Recusal]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 06, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [Leave to]
  • January 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 26, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 26, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.