U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Tkachuk v. Enterprise Rent-A-Car et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 02, 2019: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 17, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Status Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 23, 2018: [Reply]
  • May 14, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 30, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.