U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Berrigan et al v. United Parcel Service Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 15, 2019: [Affidavit]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 14, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 30, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 05, 2018: [Response]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 09, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • November 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 05, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 22, 2018: [Compel]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 22, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 17, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 31, 2018: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 19, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 25, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 23, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Reply]
  • March 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 06, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • February 22, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 21, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 01, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 31, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 31, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • January 31, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.