U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Farrington v. SSC Cheyenne Operating Company LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • November 13, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • November 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Suggestion of Death]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Supplement]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • March 27, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 20, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 15, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • March 01, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 01, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • February 05, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.