U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Werner v Johnson County Sheriff, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Letter(s)]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • January 10, 2019: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • November 02, 2018: [Show Cause]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 22, 2018: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 25, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 22, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Supplement]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • May 23, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Reopening Case]
  • May 23, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • May 22, 2018: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • May 15, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • February 06, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 05, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 05, 2018: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.