U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Huff et al v. CRST International Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 22, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Exhibit/Witness List]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • March 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 01, 2018: [Praecipe]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 26, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • February 20, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 13, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Removal]
  • February 08, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • February 07, 2018: [Complaint]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.