U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00027
  • Case Name: TRAP Trucking LLC v. Pierce et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 18, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 14, 2019: [Vacate]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Pretrial Memorandum]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 20, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • November 09, 2018: [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Strike]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 20, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 30, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 08, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • May 07, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 19, 2018: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Financial Entry]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 28, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 23, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • February 20, 2018: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • February 13, 2018: [Removal]
  • February 09, 2018: [Complaint]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.