U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Gillenwater v. United States District Court for the District of Idaho ChiefJudge et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 05, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 26, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 26, 2018: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • February 26, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
  • February 12, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 12, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 12, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.