U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Creighton v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 21, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 21, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 21, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on 2255 Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 03, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Mail Returned]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 21, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.