U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Vyve Broadband J LLC v. Mountain West Technologies Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2018: [Dismiss]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 09, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • June 15, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 14, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • June 11, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 11, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 01, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • May 11, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 11, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • May 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 11, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 23, 2018: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • April 19, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 23, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 23, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.