U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Bryant v. Hayter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 30, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 26, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 11, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 11, 2019: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Witness List]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 22, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • May 22, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.