U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Stotts v. Memorial Hospital of Laramie County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2019: [Dismiss]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Statement]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 14, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 19, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 02, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.