U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Corrigan v. Schauss
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 10, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 09, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 09, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 26, 2018: [Recusal]
  • March 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.