U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Cisco v. Brooks et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 14, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 05, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 22, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 19, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 19, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 25, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.