U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00056
  • Case Name: King et al v. Diversified Consultants Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 06, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 06, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 02, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 04, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 04, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.