U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Patterson v. Jefferson County Jail Detention Chief et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 23, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 23, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • October 16, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 09, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 20, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 17, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order]
  • September 12, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • September 10, 2018: [Letter(s)]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • August 13, 2018: [Letter(s)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Transferring Case]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.