U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Guy v. Pacheco et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 20, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 14, 2018: [Reply]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 23, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • July 23, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • July 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 25, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Response]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
  • May 17, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • May 17, 2018: [Service of Process]
  • May 10, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 11, 2018: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • April 11, 2018: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 04, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 04, 2018: [Service of Process]
  • April 04, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.