U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00060
  • Case Name: LaBrecque v. Laramie County Sheriffs Dept. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Reply]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • August 22, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 03, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order]
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 23, 2018: [Martinez Report]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 29, 2018: [Acceptance of Service]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 22, 2018: [Requiring Martinez Report]
  • May 21, 2018: [Letter(s)]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.