U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Lacoste v. CRST Expedited Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2019: [Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 16, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 07, 2019: [Reply]
  • June 07, 2019: [Request for Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 31, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 28, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 24, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 22, 2019: [Strike]
  • May 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 17, 2019: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Request for Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2019: [Supplement]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 01, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 29, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 23, 2019: [Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 02, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 25, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 25, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 01, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • June 01, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 23, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 04, 2018: [Minute Order]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2018: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.