U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00063
  • Case Name: First Interstate Bank v. McKinnon Unlimited, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • July 24, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 21, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 08, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.