U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00065
  • Case Name: McElley v. Folsom et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2019: [Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 14, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Status Conference]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 18, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 16, 2018: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • May 16, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 11, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 03, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 19, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.