U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Bergquist v. Chilton
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 26, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 14, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • February 08, 2019: [Strike]
  • February 05, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 12, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • July 12, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 01, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • June 01, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.