U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Nicklas et al v. Professional Assistance LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 28, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • April 19, 2019: [Response]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 13, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 06, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 04, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 15, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 17, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 09, 2018: [Vacate]
  • August 09, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 03, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 09, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • July 03, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • July 02, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Dismiss]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 30, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 20, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.