U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:04-cv-00317
  • Case Name: DeLoge v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 23, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 23, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 23, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • August 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • July 23, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Set Aside]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [USCA Order]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 12, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • December 10, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 10, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 07, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • December 06, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 04, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 04, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 04, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 16, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Reply]
  • November 01, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 03, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 02, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Default Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Default Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2018: [Reconsideration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.