U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Brown et al v. Shell Rocky Mountain Production LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2019: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 13, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 12, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • September 09, 2019: [Designation]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • August 29, 2019: [Supplement]
  • August 29, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 28, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 27, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 26, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • August 26, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 26, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 23, 2019: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • August 23, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 21, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 21, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 16, 2019: [In Limine]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 11, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • July 09, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Supplement]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Supplement]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 09, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 08, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 25, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 17, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 06, 2018: [Financial Entry]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 27, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.