U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Williams v. Feldman
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 26, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • November 29, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • November 28, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 09, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 25, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Response]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 24, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 24, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 22, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 10, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Reply]
  • July 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2018: [Show Cause]
  • July 12, 2018: [Show Cause]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 08, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 04, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • May 01, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.