U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:07-cv-00065
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Carlson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 06, 2022: [Compel]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Application for Writ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • May 08, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • May 03, 2018: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.