U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Mountain v. Community Health Center of Central Wyoming Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • May 15, 2018: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 07, 2018: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2018: [Complaint]
  • May 03, 2018: [Removal]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.