U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Ziegler v. Dale et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Closing Case]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • October 22, 2021: [In Court Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Certify Class]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • June 21, 2021: [Certify Class]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 13, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [Response]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Enforce Settlement Agreement]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • August 13, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • July 29, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • April 06, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • February 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 13, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2019: [Status Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 06, 2019: [Staying Case]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 14, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 07, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • August 01, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 24, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 15, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 14, 2019: [Response]
  • May 14, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • May 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 14, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 08, 2019: [Brief]
  • May 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 08, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • May 01, 2019: [Brief]
  • May 01, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 24, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • April 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 03, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 21, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 20, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 07, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • November 02, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 11, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 11, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 05, 2018: [Strike]
  • October 05, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 05, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • September 21, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 17, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 05, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 04, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 24, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Strike]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order]
  • August 22, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 22, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 21, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • August 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 17, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 16, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 13, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 03, 2018: [Minute Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 30, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • July 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • July 02, 2018: [Praecipe]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.