U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Williams v. Wyoming Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Objection]
  • November 07, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • November 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2018: [Objection]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Brief]
  • October 29, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2018: [Objection]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • September 05, 2018: [Response]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 23, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 22, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 16, 2018: [Response]
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 09, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 03, 2018: [Compel]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • June 21, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • June 20, 2018: [Response]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 04, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Letter(s)]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 15, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.