U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Michaels v. Flagstar Bank FSB
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 04, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 10, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • May 09, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2019: [Brief]
  • May 06, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 06, 2019: [Exhibit/Witness List]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • April 05, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Errata]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2019: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • February 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 01, 2019: [Response in Support of Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 29, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 09, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 15, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 15, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 29, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • June 27, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2018: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order]
  • June 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 24, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 18, 2018: [Removal]
  • May 18, 2018: [Complaint]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.