U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Preece et al v. Burr
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 02, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2018
  • December 22, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 25, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 21, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 21, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 07, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 30, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • July 24, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.