U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00077
  • Case Name: First Interstate Bank v. McBratney et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 16, 2019: [Approve Consent Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 19, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 27, 2018: [In Court Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • November 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 21, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • November 14, 2018: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 14, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • November 09, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 09, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 02, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 24, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.