U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Cooper et al v. Reichert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • March 13, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 07, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 07, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 06, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • March 01, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • February 15, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 15, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 05, 2019: [Response]
  • February 05, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Facts]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 29, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 28, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 21, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 14, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • January 11, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 10, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 08, 2018: [Witness List]
  • November 02, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 20, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 15, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 11, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 30, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 30, 2018: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.