U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00079
  • Case Name: USI Insurance Services LLC v. Craig et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • May 22, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • May 22, 2019: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • May 22, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 07, 2019: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • April 22, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 18, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Opposition]
  • April 08, 2019: [Response]
  • April 02, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Response]
  • March 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • February 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • July 30, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • July 24, 2018: [Response]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 11, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 10, 2018: [Reply]
  • July 09, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 18, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 18, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 15, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • May 24, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.